GA HB231 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding prosecuting attorneys, so as to create the Prosecuting Attorneys Oversight Commission; to provide for definitions; to provide for the powers, composition, appointment, and confirmation of such commission; to provide for commission members' terms, vacancies, and removals; to provide for procedures and confidentiality; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Prosecuting Attorneys Oversight Commission; create
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Stan Gunter [R] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #196 (Y: 70 N: 98 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #195 (Y: 98 N: 75 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #195 (Y: 98 N: 75 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hopper |