GA HB230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to business corporations, so as to provide for benefit corporations; to provide for the application of the Georgia Business Corporation Code; to provide for definitions; to provide for naming; to provide for stock certificates; to provide for amendments and transactions; to provide for duties and limitations of liability of directors of benefit corporations; to provide for annual public benefit reports; to change the definition of a foreign corporation; to change provisions relating to the right to dissent; to change provisions relating to the corporate name of a foreign corporation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business corporations; provide for benefit corporations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #772 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #159 (Y: 165 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective Date
2020-07-29 Act 487
2020-07-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-25SenateSenate Third Read
2020-01-29SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-01-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-11HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback