GA HB230 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 5 of Title 28 and Code Section 35-3-37 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Claims Advisory Board and review of individual's criminal history record information, definitions, privacy considerations, and inspections, respectively, so as to provide for compensation of persons wrongfully convicted and imprisoned; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Claims Advisory Board; compensation of persons wrongfully convicted and imprisoned; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] |
Rep. Rahn Mayo [D] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #245 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House Hopper |