GA HB228 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-67 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to distribution of unidentifiable sales and use tax proceeds, so as to repeal certain provisions regarding limitations on the state revenue commissioner's authority to make certain distributions; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; distribution of unidentifiable proceeds; limit commissioner's authority
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Rick Austin [R] | Rep. Michael Harden [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Rep. Jan Tankersley [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #175 - Passage (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-15 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-10 | House First Readers |