GA HB227 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state sales and use taxation, so as to remove programmable thermostats from the definition of Energy Star Qualified Product for purposes of the state sales tax holiday; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; programmable thermostats from the definition of Energy Star Qualified Product for purposes of the state sales tax holiday; remove
Sponsors
Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House Vote #50 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43347 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/146929 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43347#12224 |