GA HB222 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 40th, 4th
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 40th, 4th
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 7 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to HOPE scholarships and grants, so as to provide that members of the Georgia National Guard and reservists meet residency requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
HOPE; members of Georgia National Guard and reservists meet residency requirement; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #347 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #226 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #99 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #226 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #99 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 40th, 4th |
2017-03-30 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 175th, 116th |
2017-03-30 | House | House Insisted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hopper |