GA HB222 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 40th, 4th
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 7 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to HOPE scholarships and grants, so as to provide that members of the Georgia National Guard and reservists meet residency requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOPE; members of Georgia National Guard and reservists meet residency requirement; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #347 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #226 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #99 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 40th, 4th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 175th, 116th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-28HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-22SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-02HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback