GA HB216 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the organization and members of the Public Service Commission, to change certain provisions relating to the chairperson of the commission and his or her selection; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Service Commission; chairperson selection; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #115 - Passage (Y: 60 N: 103 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-15 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-10 | House First Readers |