GA HB208 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of hospitals and related institutions, so as to require nursing homes to annually offer influenza vaccinations to its health care workers and other employees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nursing homes; annually offer influenza vaccinations to health care workers and other employees; require
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #254 (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Vote #65 (Y: 118 N: 40 NV: 9 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Vote #65 (Y: 118 N: 40 NV: 9 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 255 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-05 | House | House Hopper |