GA HB193 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 91 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public works contracting and bidding requirements, so as to increase the dollar values of certain public works construction contracts exempt from bidding requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; increase dollar values of certain public works construction contracts exempt from bidding requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Victor Anderson [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Bill Yearta [R] |
Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Amendment: Senate Vote #348 (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Agree To Senate Am As Am: House Vote #330 (Y: 157 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #263 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #48 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Agree To Senate Am As Am: House Vote #330 (Y: 157 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #263 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #48 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Veto V4 | |
2023-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-27 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-01 | House | House Hopper |