GA HB182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state sales and use tax, so as to lower the threshold amount for certain dealers; to eliminate an option for certain retailers to choose to either collect and remit sales and use taxes or provide certain notifications to certain purchasers and the state; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; lower threshold amount for certain dealers
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #346 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #123 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #346 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #123 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 63 | |
2019-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |