GA HB17 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 9 and Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitations of actions and child abuse and deprivation records, respectively, so as to extend the statute of limitations for actions for childhood sexual abuse; to provide for a short title; to provide for limitations of liability for certain legal entities; to change provisions relating to tolling of limitations for a minor's cause of action; to change provisions relating to the tolling of limitations for tort actions while criminal prosecution is pending; to change provisions relating to the confidentiality and use of certain records; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hidden Predator Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] | Rep. Greg Morris [R] |
Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #446 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #316 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #242 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #316 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #242 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 97 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
2014-12-03 | House | House Prefiled |