GA HB1601 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Effective Date 2024-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Effective Date 2024-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act revising, superseding, and consolidating the laws creating and governing the Board of Commissioners of Echols County, approved February 3, 1953 (Ga. L. 1953, Jan.-Feb. Sess., p. 2054), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 27, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4575), so as to increase the size of the board of commissioners; to provide for residency requirements; to provide for the description of the commissioner districts and posts; to define certain terms and provide for certain inclusions; to provide for election of members; to provide for initial terms; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Echols County; Board of Commissioners; increase size
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #775 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #793 (Y: 153 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #793 (Y: 153 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Effective Date 2024-01-01 | |
2022-04-11 | Act 589 | |
2022-04-11 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Hopper |