GA HB1557 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Paulding County, approved April 17, 1975 (Ga. L. 1975, p. 2916), as amended, so as to provide for an office of county manager; to provide for the duties, powers, and role of the county manager; to revise provisions related to meetings of the commission; to revise the duties, powers, and role of the chairperson of the board of commissioners; to reduce the bond of the chairperson; to revise the list of named county departments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Paulding County; Board of Commissions; provide office of county manager
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #831 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #775 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #775 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 734 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Hopper |