GA HB1473 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Fort Valley; to repeal specific Acts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fort Valley, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #716 (Y: 163 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68800 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/227099 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68800#24313 |