GA HB1425 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Weeping Time Cultural Heritage Corridor Authority; to provide for definitions; to provide for the purpose and powers of the authority; to provide for appointment, eligibility, and terms of members of the authority; to provide for organization, quorum, meetings, and expenses of the authority; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for agents and employees; to provide for accountability and for financial and other records; to provide for audits; to limit the powers of the authority; to provide for open meetings and public records; to provide for judicial jurisdiction; to provide that the powers of the authority are supplemental; to provide for liberal construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Weeping Time Cultural Heritage Corridor Authority; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #712 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #701 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #701 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Effective Date 2024-05-06 | |
2024-05-06 | Act 660 | |
2024-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-08 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House Hopper |