GA HB14 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 87 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to participation in federal programs, so as to provide that no local authority or local government shall accept federal funds in any form or for any purpose unless the acceptance of such federal funds has been approved by an Act of the General Assembly; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding state government, so as to provide that no state authority, agency, board, bureau, commission, department, office, public corporation, or other entity of state government shall accept federal funds in any form or for any purpose unless the acceptance of such federal funds has been approved by an Act of the General Assembly; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fiscal Accountability Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] |
Rep. David Stover [R] | Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-14 | House | House Hopper |
2014-12-02 | House | House Prefiled |