GA HB138 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to landlord and tenant in general, so as to provide that certain landlords shall provide certain notices to existing and prospective tenants with regard to certain crimes occurring on the premises being leased; to provide for sanctions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; certain landlords shall provide certain notices to existing and prospective tenants with regard to certain crimes occurring on the premises being leased; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] | Sen. Derek Mallow [D] | Rep. Mandisha Thomas [D] | Rep. Marvin Lim [D] |
Rep. Zulma Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #238 (Y: 128 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House Hopper |