GA HB1340 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7A of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to practice of applied behavior analysis, so as to provide for credentialing of qualified behavior analysts and qualified autism services practitioner-supervisors; to revise definitions; to provide for board membership; to provide for licensure qualifications; to provide for temporary licenses; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; credentialing of qualified behavior analysts and qualified autism services practitioner-supervisors; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Hilton [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Bethany Ballard [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] |
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67222 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/224667 |