GA HB1278 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the Magistrate Court of Spalding County to charge a technology fee for each civil case filed and criminal fine imposed; to specify the uses to which such technology fees may be put; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Spalding County Magistrate Court; charge technology fee for each civil case filed and criminal fine imposed; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #722 - Local Calendar Without Hb 1113 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #722 - Local Calendar Without Hb 1113 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 543 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-20 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House First Readers |