GA HB1233 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 12, Title 27, and Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions of the Department of Natural Resources, game and fish, and general provisions of the registration, operation, and sale of watercraft, respectively, so as to delay the earliest effective date for certain rules and regulations for which criminal violations may be established; to set certain requirements for weapons used for hunting migratory game birds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Natural Resources, Department of; earliest effective date for certain rules and regulations; delay
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #680 (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #557 (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #557 (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 770 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hopper |