GA HB1231 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the Chehaw Park Authority, approved April 11, 1979 (Ga. L. 1979, p. 4515), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 13, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 5755), so as to change the name of the park; to expand the purpose of the authority to include the acquisition of zoological specimens; to change procedures for the appointment of authority members; to change provisions regarding a quorum and majority of the authority; to make the city manager of the City of Albany a voting member of the authority; to revise definitions; to remove certain duties of the City of Albany regarding the authority; to extend the existence of the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chehaw Park Authority; change name of park; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #692 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-29 Effective Date
2020-07-29 Act 536
2020-07-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-07-01HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-06-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-06-19HouseHouse First Readers
2020-06-18HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback