GA HB1216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from City of Union City ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in the amount of $2,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that city; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Union City; City of; ad valorem tax; provide homestead exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] |
Sen. Nikema Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 437 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Hopper |