GA HB1210 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Bryan County, approved March 22, 1941 (Ga. L. 1941, p. 765), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 30, 1971 (Ga. L. 1971, p. 2337), so as to provide that the board shall prescribe by resolution the time, place, and dates for its regular meetings; to provide for called meetings and special sessions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bryan County; Board of Commissioners prescribe time, place, and dates for meetings; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #634 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-28 | Act 511 | |
2010-05-28 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-18 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-17 | House First Readers |