GA HB119 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to make and provide appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2009, and ending June 30, 2010.
Title
General appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2009 - June 30, 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Burkalter [R] | Rep. Jim Cole [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. James Richardson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #435 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #491 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 137 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #344 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #343 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By Senator From The 26th To Committee Sub (Y: 21 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-03-19 - House - House Vote #302 - Pass (Y: 123 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-19 - House - House Vote #301 - Suspend Rules (Y: 57 N: 111 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #491 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 137 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #344 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #343 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By Senator From The 26th To Committee Sub (Y: 21 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-03-19 - House - House Vote #302 - Pass (Y: 123 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-19 - House - House Vote #301 - Suspend Rules (Y: 57 N: 111 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 345 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-01 | House Insists | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Insists | |
2009-04-01 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-19 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2009-03-19 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-19 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-16 | House First Readers |