GA HB1161 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Blue Ridge in Fannin County, approved March 21, 1989 (Ga. L. 1989, p. 3823), as amended, so as to provide for staggered terms of the mayor and councilmembers; to revise provisions regarding the filling of vacancies on the governing authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Blue Ridge, City of; staggered terms of mayor and councilmembers; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58295 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/193082 |