GA HB1157 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Broxton, Georgia, in the County of Coffee, approved April 6, 1981 (Ga. L. 1981, p. 3597), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 6, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 5320), an ordinance filed February 16, 2004 (Ga. L. 2004, p. 4777), an Act approved May 16, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 3549), and an Act approved May 6, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 3780), so as to provide qualifications for the city attorney and municipal court judge; to provide for the compensation of the municipal court judge; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Broxton, City of; city attorney and municipal court judge qualifications; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #554 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Vote #583 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Vote #583 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-28 | Act 517 | |
2010-05-28 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-16 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-11 | House First Readers |