GA HB115 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local boards of education, so as to revise provisions relating to suspension and removal of local school board members under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local boards of education; suspension and removal of members under certain circumstances; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] |
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Vote #388 (Y: 122 N: 45 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #247 (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #248 (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Vote #33 (Y: 151 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #247 (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #248 (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Vote #33 (Y: 151 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 244 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-28 | House | House Hopper |