GA HB1142 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the creation of one or more community improvement districts in Forsyth County, approved May 6, 2019 (Ga. L. 2019, p. 3963), so as to authorize the creation or expansion of one or more community improvement districts in any municipality in Forsyth County; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Forsyth County; creation or expansion of one or more community improvement districts in any municipality; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Marc Morris [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] |
Rep. Sheri Gilligan [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #663 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 343 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House Hopper |