GA HB11 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-22 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-22 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-1126 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to written policies and procedures for operation of school buses, so as to require local school systems to establish specific procedures and safety precautions regarding unloading children under eight years of age from a school bus; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
School buses; local school systems establish specific procedures and safety precautions regarding unloading children under eight; require
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-20 | House | House Hopper |
2012-11-28 | House | House Prefiled |