GA HB1094 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-24 - House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-24 - House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 20 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding personnel administration, so as to provide for paid parental leave for state employees; to provide for a definition; to provide for eligibility; to provide for terms and conditions; to provide for certain prohibitions; to provide for rules; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public officers and employees; paid parental leave for state employees; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #709 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #557 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #709 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #557 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read Tabled |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House Hopper |