GA HB1083 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating and establishing the State Court of Tift County, approved March 30, 1971 (Ga. L. 1971, p. 2468), so as to change the office of the solicitor of the state court to a full-time position; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tift County; State Court; change the office of the solicitor to a full-time position
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #571 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #624 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #624 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 546 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Hopper |