GA HB1082 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Blakely; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide a specific repealer; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Blakely, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #576 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #624 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #624 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 545 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Hopper |