GA HB1080 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of commissioners of roads and revenues for Peach County, approved March 10, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 2627), as amended, particularly by an Act approved February 27, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 3607), so as to change the description of the districts from which members of such board are elected; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peach County; Board of Commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #485 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #475 (Y: 104 N: 61 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #475 (Y: 104 N: 61 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 416 | |
2022-02-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House Hopper |