GA HB1060 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to carrying and possession of firearms; to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to disposition of property seized; to amend Code Section 35-3-34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses, resulting responsibility and liability of issuing center, and provision of certain information to the FBI in conjunction with the National Instant Criminal Background Check System; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 51 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding torts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; carrying and possession of firearms; confirm that the right of the people to keep and bear arms shall not be infringed
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Rep. Dustin Hightower [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #859 (Y: 101 N: 60 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #667 (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #683 (Y: 120 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #667 (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #683 (Y: 120 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Veto V12 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-19 | House | House Hopper |