GA HB1057 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 12 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to soil amendments, so as to authorize further regulation of soil amendments derived from industrial by-products by local governments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; further regulation of soil amendments derived from industrial by-products by local governments; authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #769 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #597 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-25SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-18SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-03HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2020-03-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback