GA HB1049 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 52 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to assumption reinsurance agreements, so as to enact the "Insurance Business Transfer Act"; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for definitions; to provide for court authority; to provide for notice requirements; to provide for an application procedure; to provide for court review of a petition; to provide for ongoing jurisdiction by the court; to provide for court approval; to provide for appeal; to provide for confidentiality; to provide for ongoing oversight by the Commissioner; to provide for certain fees and costs to be borne by the applicant; to provide for compensation, costs, and expenses of the independent expert and any consultants to be borne jointly by the transferring insurer and assuming insurer; to provide for dismissal of petition; to provide for construction; to make conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance Business Transfer Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #883 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #877 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #532 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #877 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #532 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Effective Date 2024-05-06 | |
2024-05-06 | Act 592 | |
2024-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House Hopper |