GA HB1047 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act continuing the State Court of Coweta County, approved May 17, 2004 (Ga. L. 2004, p. 4260), so as to revise the terms of court of the State Court of Coweta County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Coweta County; State Court; revise terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #576 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #582 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #582 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 561 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Hopper |