GA HB1045 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-8-8.3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the funding of services, or reduction of ad valorem taxes, in unincorporated areas of counties and powers and duties of governing authority, so as to include flood risk reduction in the enumerated list of county purposes for which certain proceeds from county taxes shall be used; to provide that funding for flood risk reduction shall be derived specifically from premium taxes; to provide for a definition; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; include flood risk reduction in the enumerated list of county purposes for which certain proceeds from county taxes shall be used

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #600 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback