GA HB1038 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to assault and battery, so as to provide for the offense of reproductive battery; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide that consent to an anonymous donor is not a defense; to provide for the tolling of statute of limitations; to provide for civil actions; to provide for revocation of license; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; offense of reproductive battery; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Daniel [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. Scott Hilton [R] | Rep. Kenneth Vance [R] |
Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. Bethany Ballard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hopper |