GA HB1031 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide that, if the votes received by a candidate in a primary or election are within not more than 1 percent of the total votes which were cast for such office in such primary or election of receiving a majority of the votes cast for such office and being declared as the candidate nominated or elected, such candidate shall be qualified to request a recount; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; candidate who receives votes within not more than 1 percent of total votes shall be qualified to request a recount; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48472 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/157599 |