GA HB1028 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved April 26, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3726), as amended, so as to require review of ordinances by committees prior to adoption; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; require review of ordinances by committees prior to adoption
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Rep. Marie Metze [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57774 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/191018 |