GA HB101 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the Board of Education of Schley County, approved March 4, 1977 (Ga. L. 1977, p. 2955), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 8, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 3822), so as to change the description of education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Schley County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #20 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Vote #19 (Y: 146 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Vote #19 (Y: 146 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 110 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |