GA HB1008 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Education of Liberty County, approved February 10, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 3542), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 1, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 3632), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for submission of this Act for approval under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Liberty County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #540 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Vote #525 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Vote #525 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-13 | Act 376 | |
2012-03-13 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-23 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |