FL S7100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting from public records requirements certain security information held by the Department of the Lottery, information about lottery games, personal identifying information of retailers and vendors for purposes of background checks, and certain financial information held by the department; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Department of the Lottery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7121
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted HB 7121
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-11SenateFiled
2019-04-10SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-03-28SenateSubmitted for consideration by Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Same As/Similar To

H7121 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-41

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
24105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
241051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24118Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback