FL H7121 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that certain information held by Department of Lottery is confidential & exempt from public record requirements; provides for retroactive application; provides public necessity statement; provides directive to Division of Law Revision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Lottery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#244 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Chapter No. 2019-41
2019-05-14 Approved by Governor
2019-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-26SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for SB 7100
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HousePassed; YEAS 96 NAYS 12
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-18HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/18/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2019-04-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7100 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7121

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
24105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
241051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24118Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback