FL S7088 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Submit as committee bill by Budget (SB 2094)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Submit as committee bill by Budget (SB 2094)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the resolution of collective bargaining issues at impasse between the state and certified bargaining units of state employees.
Title
State Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Submit as committee bill by Budget (SB 2094) | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/02/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/01/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Submitted as Committee Bill | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/31/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-03-27 | Submitted for consideration by Budget |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7088 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7088/BillText/Filed/HTML |