FL S7064 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a court to modify or continue a probationary term upon finding that a probationer has met all specified conditions, rather than any of the conditions, after a violation of probation, etc.
Title
Probation Violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7091 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted HB 7091 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 3 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H7091 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages