FL H7091 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises circumstances under which court must modify or continue term of probation.
Title
Probation Violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#537 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#537 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in returning Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-12 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (683480) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (254366) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7064 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 2 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7064 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7091