FL S7042 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Governors to adopt regulations regarding the naming or renaming of state university facilities; specifying elements that must be addressed in the naming or renaming process; providing applicability; deleting a prohibition against the naming of facilities in a certain manner, etc.
Title
State University Facility Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Education; Rules |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
267 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |